Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elizeu de Morais Pimentel

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1952Born
10 Jul 198229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
19 Dec 200149.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
16 Mar 200249.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
6 Apr 200249.4InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
27 Feb 200350.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elizeu de Morais Pimentel
Bishop Elizeu de Morais Pimentel (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Paranavaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuatiguá

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,148
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast