Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Freusberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1881BornOlpe
6 Apr 190927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
12 Apr 195371.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
12 Apr 195371.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Epiro
11 Jun 195371.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Epiro
10 Apr 196482.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Freusberg:
Bishop Josef Freusberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015