Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Gaborone

Dioecesis Gaboronensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 7 April 1970
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pretoria
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Botswana
  • Square Kilometers: 178,301 (68,868 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 218, Plot 162 Queens Rd., Gaborone, Botswana
  • Telephone: 391.29.58
  • Fax: 395.69.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland
2 April 1959ErectedDiocese of Bulawayo
Diocese of Kimberley
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
Prefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland (erected)
Diocese of Gaberones
5 August 1966ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland Diocese of Gaberones
Diocese of Gaborone
7 April 1970Name ChangedDiocese of Gaberones Diocese of Gaborone
27 June 1998Territory LostDiocese of Gaborone Vicariate Apostolic of Francistown (erected)
5 June 2007Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Gaborone (from Bloemfontein)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Gaborone
197016,879611,0002.8%222247032426ap1971
197829,199793,0003.7%321241,2162353ap1981
199045,8261,100,0004.2%323261,7621345126ap1991
199959,325700,0008.5%421252,3731232717ap2000
200060,134703,0008.6%420242,5051223217ap2001
200160,893719,0008.5%621272,2551234618ap2002
200261,675875,9007.0%1020302,0551235018ap2003
200362,497957,1006.5%723302,0831253917ap2004
200463,257904,9007.0%625312,0401274418ap2005
200663,9261,003,6456.4%1120312,0625225320ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011