Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boniface Tshosa Setlalekgosi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gaborone, Botswana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1927Born
22 Jul 196335.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bechuanaland, Botswana
30 Nov 198154.2AppointedBishop of Gaborone, Botswana
6 Mar 198254.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gaborone, Botswana
5 Feb 200981.3RetiredBishop of Gaborone, Botswana
25 Jan 201991.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Gaborone, Botswana

MicroData Summary for Boniface Tshosa Setlalekgosi
Bishop Boniface Tshosa Setlalekgosi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gaborone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerowe
Death PlaceGaborone Private, Hospital, Gaborone, Diocese of Gaborone

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Jan 2019

Quantcast