Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Lancelot Paxton Hallett, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rustenburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1916BornPietermaritzburg
8 Sep 194832.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Sep 195337.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Sep 197155.5AppointedPrefect of Rustenburg, South Africa
18 Nov 198771.6AppointedBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa
30 Jan 198871.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa
30 Jan 199073.8DiedBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Henry Lancelot Paxton Hallett:
Bishop Henry Lancelot Paxton Hallett C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Rustenburg

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,912
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015