Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Colburn Garner

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1907BornQumbu
23 Dec 193326.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 194840.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pretoria, South Africa
9 Apr 194840.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tracula
31 May 194840.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tracula
11 Jan 195143.3AppointedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
17 May 195143.6AppointedBishop of South Africa, Military
28 Apr 197567.6ResignedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
26 Mar 197668.5ResignedBishop of South Africa, Military
12 Jun 199385.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pretoria, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Colburn Garner:
Archbishop John Colburn Garner (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013