Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Francis Daniel

Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1933 BornPretoria
19 Dec 196431.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pretoria, South Africa
28 Apr 197542.0AppointedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
3 Aug 197542.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
26 Mar 197642.9AppointedBishop of South Africa, Military
24 Nov 200875.5RetiredArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
24 Nov 200875.5RetiredBishop of South Africa, Military

MicroData Summary for George Francis Daniel:
Archbishop George Francis Daniel (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pretoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015