Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lawrence Patrick Henry

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1934BornCape Town
22 Dec 196228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
27 Apr 198752.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
27 Apr 198752.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
16 Aug 198753.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
7 Jul 199055.9AppointedArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
29 Aug 199056.1InstalledArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
18 Dec 200975.4RetiredArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
4 Mar 201479.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Patrick Henry:
Archbishop Lawrence Patrick Henry (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,714
  • d: CB, 5 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 5 Mar 2014