Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Michael Cawcutt

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

Titular Bishop of Egabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1938 BornCape Town
9 Jul 196223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
29 May 199253.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
29 May 199253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Egabro
26 Aug 199253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egabro
17 Jul 200263.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Reginald Michael Cawcutt:
Bishop Reginald Michael Cawcutt (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,790

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013