Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph James Potocnak, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of De Aar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1933 BornBerwick
21 Sep 196633.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
23 Jan 199258.6AppointedBishop of De Aar, South Africa
1 May 199258.9Ordained BishopBishop of De Aar, South Africa
17 Jul 200976.1RetiredBishop of De Aar, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph James Potocnak:
Bishop Joseph James Potocnak S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of De Aar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of De Aar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,676

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015