Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fritz Lobinger

Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1929 Born
29 Jun 195526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
18 Nov 198758.8AppointedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
27 Feb 198859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
29 Apr 200475.2RetiredBishop of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Fritz Lobinger
Bishop Fritz Lobinger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal

EventPlace
Birth PlacePassau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aliwal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,612
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018