Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mary Kizito

Bishop of Aliwal, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1967 Born
14 Dec 199629.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Aliwal, South Africa
27 Sep 199730.2Ordained PriestPriest of Aliwal, South Africa
15 Nov 201952.3AppointedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
15 Feb 202052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mary Kizito
Bishop Joseph Mary Kizito (born ) Bishop of Aliwal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRubaga-Wakaliga, Archdiocese of Kampala, Uganda
Ordained BishopSauer Park Stadium, Aliwal North, Diocese of Aliwal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aliwal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2019
  • mn/c02+: CB, 23 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast