Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Wüstenberg

Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1954 Born
5 Jun 198227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
19 Dec 200753.4AppointedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
24 Feb 200853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
1 Sep 201763.1ResignedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Michael Wüstenberg
Bishop Michael Wüstenberg (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDortmund, Germany

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aliwal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,680
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast