Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aliwal

Dioecesis Alivalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michael Wüstenberg, Bishop
  • Fritz Lobinger, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 31,200 (12,051 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://catholic-aliwal.org/
  • Mailing Address: 24 Young Street, P.O. Box 27, Aliwal North 9750, C.P., South Africa
  • Telephone: (051)61.10.026
  • Fax: 63.33.078

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Gariep
12 June 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Gariep (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Aliwal
27 January 1936ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Gariep Vicariate Apostolic of Aliwal
11 January 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Aliwal
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
Archdiocese of Bloemfontein (erected)
Diocese of Aliwal
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Aliwal Diocese of Aliwal
24 March 1953Territory LostDiocese of Aliwal Prefecture Apostolic of De Aar (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Aliwal
195012,135302,0004.0%52732379616719ap1951
Diocese of Aliwal
195710,285200,0005.1%3192246761689ap1960
197023,785228,00010.4%822307922816018ap1971
198031,885260,00012.3%318211,51826192ap1981
199044,000286,00015.4%416202,2002212616ap1991
199947,997509,9979.4%912212,285139316ap2000
200047,727518,7279.2%1112232,075189516ap2001
200144,991530,0008.5%1112231,956189716ap2002
200245,528530,0008.6%1212241,897189516ap2003
200345,151530,0008.5%1312251,806139916ap2004
200441,260530,0007.8%139221,875109916ap2005
200642,300536,0007.9%148221,92296216ap2007
201240,400559,0007.2%118192,1269502ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013