Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulgence Werner Le Roy, O.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Pietersburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1924 BornBeervelde
22 Sep 194723.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jul 195227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jul 197550.8AppointedAbbot of Pietersburg, South Africa
10 Jul 197550.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausafa
14 Sep 197551.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausafa
15 Dec 198864.3AppointedBishop of Pietersburg, South Africa
17 Feb 200075.4RetiredBishop of Pietersburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Fulgence Werner Le Roy:
Bishop Fulgence Werner Le Roy O.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pietersburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pietersburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015