Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evaristus Thatho Bitsoane

Deceased

Bishop of Qacha’s Nek


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1938BornRojane
19 Dec 196426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
17 Jul 198142.8AppointedBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
11 Oct 198143.1Ordained BishopBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
17 Jul 201071.8DiedBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Evaristus Thatho Bitsoane:
Bishop Evaristus Thatho Bitsoane (born , died ) Bishop of Qacha’s Nek

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013