Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerard Tlali Lerotholi, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Maseru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1954 BornMokhotlong
25 Jan 197621.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
198126.8Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
3 Jan 198227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Jun 200955.3AppointedArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho
12 Sep 200955.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Gerard Tlali Lerotholi:
Archbishop Gerard Tlali Lerotholi O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Maseru

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maseru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015