Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Fani Chakaipa

Deceased

Archbishop of Harare, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1932Born
15 Aug 196533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
15 Oct 197240.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
15 Oct 197240.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rucuma
14 Jan 197340.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rucuma
31 May 197643.9AppointedArchbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
8 Apr 200370.7DiedArchbishop of Harare, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Patrick Fani Chakaipa
Archbishop Patrick Fani Chakaipa (born , died ) Archbishop of Harare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMhondoro

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Feb 2017