Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Mumbure Mutume

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe

Titular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1943Born
3 Sep 197228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Umtali, Zimbabwe
15 Mar 197935.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
15 Mar 197935.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
17 Jun 197935.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
8 Feb 201773.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Patrick Mumbure Mutume
Bishop Patrick Mumbure Mutume (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mutare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMutare, Diocese of Mutare
Death PlaceMutare, Diocese of Mutare

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Feb 2017