Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexio Churu Muchabaiwa

Bishop Emeritus of Mutare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1939 BornWedza
24 Aug 196829.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 198142.3AppointedBishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
21 Feb 198242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
28 May 201676.9RetiredBishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Alexio Churu Muchabaiwa
Bishop Alexio Churu Muchabaiwa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mutare

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mutare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Sep 2016