Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Gweru

Dioecesis Gueruensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Xavier Johnsai Munyongani, Bishop
  • Martin Munyanyi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 June 1982
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bulawayo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 29,158 (11,262 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 622, 77 Kopje Rd. Gweru, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (054)223.565
  • Fax: 223.381

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Victoria
14 November 1946ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort Victoria (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
24 June 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort Victoria Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
2 February 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Umtali (erected)
Diocese of Gwelo
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria Diocese of Gwelo
Diocese of Gweru
25 June 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Gwelo Diocese of Gweru
9 February 1999Territory LostDiocese of Gweru Diocese of Masvingo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
195027,937600,0004.7%30309314233ap1951
Diocese of Gwelo
1970162,8041,287,63412.6%1278901,80813719714ap1971
1980210,0001,809,00011.6%1367802,625103183ap1981
Diocese of Gweru
1990265,2152,265,00011.7%2549743,5838322343ap1991
1999196,0001,525,00012.9%2114355,6004513617ap2000
2000134,0001,521,0008.8%2316393,4354312749ap2001
2001187,7202,000,0009.4%2418424,4696812225ap2002
2002191,1742,112,9339.0%2416404,7795615225ap2003
2003195,0872,220,6858.8%2614404,8775618825ap2004
2004196,9992,109,6509.3%2514395,0516517627ap2005
2006198,0002,124,9909.3%2914434,6045815330ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jun 2014