Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier Johnsai Munyongani

Deceased

Bishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1950Born
20 Aug 197727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
9 Feb 199949.1IncardinatedPriest of Masvingo, Zimbabwe
15 Jun 201363.4AppointedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
14 Sep 201363.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
15 Oct 201767.7DiedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Xavier Johnsai Munyongani
Bishop Xavier Johnsai Munyongani (born , died ) Bishop of Gweru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMutero Mission
Ordained Bishopstade Mkoba, Gweru, Diocese of Gweru
Death PlaceAvenues Clinic, Harare, Archdiocese of Harare

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 11 Sep 2013
  • c2: CB, 14 Sep 2013
  • c34: CB, 16 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,870
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018