Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tobias Wunganayi Chiginya

Deceased

Bishop of Gweru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1935BornHama
28 Aug 196631.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
3 Feb 197741.9AppointedBishop of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
30 Apr 197742.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
14 Jan 198751.9DiedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Tobias Wunganayi Chiginya:
Bishop Tobias Wunganayi Chiginya (born , died ) Bishop of Gweru

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013