Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manual Pelino Domingues

Bishop Emeritus of Santarém, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1941 Born
15 Aug 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 198746.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
19 Dec 198746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
13 Mar 198846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
27 Jan 199856.3AppointedBishop of Santarém, Portugal
7 Oct 201776.0RetiredBishop of Santarém, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manual Pelino Domingues (VIAF: 99891188)
Bishop Manual Pelino Domingues (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santarém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLentisqueira
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santarém.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,716
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018