Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Gonçalves Cerejeira

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1888BornLousado
1 Apr 191122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
23 Mar 192839.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
23 Mar 192839.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
17 Jun 192839.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
18 Nov 192941.0AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
16 Dec 192941.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 192941.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
29 May 196677.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Portugal, Military
10 May 197182.4RetiredPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Jan 197283.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Portugal, Military
2 Aug 197788.7DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Gonçalves Cerejeira:
Manuel Cardinal Gonçalves Cerejeira (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
  • a cardinal for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 41
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014