Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Franco da Costa de Oliveira Falcão

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beja, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1922Born
29 Jun 195128.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 196644.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Dec 196644.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
22 Jan 196744.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
197451.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Beja, Portugal
8 Sep 198057.8SucceededBishop of Beja, Portugal
25 Jan 199976.2RetiredBishop of Beja, Portugal
21 Feb 201289.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary
Manuel Franco da Costa de Oliveira Falcão
Bishop Manuel Franco da Costa de Oliveira Falcão
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025