Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel José Cardinal Macário do Nascimento Clemente

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio in Campo Marzio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1948 BornTorres Vedras
29 Jun 197930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Nov 199951.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Nov 199951.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
22 Jan 200051.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinhel
22 Feb 200758.5AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
25 Mar 200758.6InstalledBishop of Porto, Portugal
18 May 201364.8AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Jul 201364.9InstalledPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Feb 201566.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201566.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio in Campo Marzio

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Macário do Nascimento Clemente:
Manuel José Cardinal Macário do Nascimento Clemente (born ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,685
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015