Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Augusto Traquina Maria

Bishop of Santarém, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1954 Born
30 Jun 198531.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
17 Apr 201460.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
17 Apr 201460.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugura
1 Jun 201460.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugura
7 Oct 201763.7AppointedBishop of Santarém, Portugal
26 Nov 201763.8InstalledBishop of Santarém, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Augusto Traquina Maria
Bishop José Augusto Traquina Maria (born ) Bishop of Santarém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcobaça
Ordained BishopJerónimos, Monastery, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santarém.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Apr 2014
  • c34: CB, 19 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,176
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Oct 2017