Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Francisco dos Santos

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1948Born
8 Dec 197224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lamego, Portugal
21 Dec 200456.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
21 Dec 200456.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnetum
19 Mar 200556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnetum
21 Sep 200658.0AppointedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
21 Feb 201465.4AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
5 Apr 201465.6InstalledBishop of Porto, Portugal
11 Sep 201769.0DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Francisco dos Santos
Bishop António Francisco dos Santos (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTendasi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lamego, Diocese of Lamego
Death PlaceCasa Episcopal, Porto, Diocese of Porto

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,838
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Oct 2017