Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Augusto de Oliveira Azevedo

Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1962 Born
13 Jul 198624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
9 Jan 201653.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
9 Jan 201653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
19 Mar 201653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
11 May 201956.9AppointedBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
30 Jun 201957.0InstalledBishop of Vila Real, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Augusto de Oliveira Azevedo
Bishop António Augusto de Oliveira Azevedo (born ) Bishop of Vila Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Pedro de Avioso, Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto, Diocese of Porto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vila Real.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 19 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,866
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Jun 2019

Quantcast