Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Tomás de Carvalho Botelho

Bishop Emeritus of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1935 BornVila da Rua
15 Aug 195822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lamego, Portugal
31 Oct 199560.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
31 Oct 199560.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
20 Jan 199660.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
20 Jan 200064.4AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
19 Nov 201176.2RetiredBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Tomás de Carvalho Botelho:
Bishop Jacinto Tomás de Carvalho Botelho (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamego

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lamego.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,676
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Feb 2014