Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Américo do Couto Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1929BornSanto Tirso
5 Jul 195324.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 199364.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
6 Jan 199465.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
5 Jan 199566.0SucceededBishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Dec 199869.9DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Américo do Couto Oliveira:
Bishop Américo do Couto Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,192
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013