Catholic-Hierarchy DC

António Augusto Cardinal dos Santos Marto

Bishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1947 Born
7 Nov 197124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vila Real, Portugal
10 Nov 200053.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
10 Nov 200053.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
11 Feb 200153.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
22 Apr 200456.9AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
22 Apr 200658.9AppointedBishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
28 Jun 201871.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201871.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
25 Nov 201871.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

MicroData Summary for António Augusto dos Santos Marto (VIAF: 121541278)
António Augusto Cardinal dos Santos Marto (born ) Bishop of Leiria-Fátima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTronco
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Conceição, Church, Vila Real, Diocese of Vila Real

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Leiria-Fátima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,902
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast