Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Tolentino Cardinal Calaça de Mendonça

Prefect of the Dicastery for Culture and Education

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Domenico e Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1965 Born
28 Jul 199024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Funchal, Portugal
26 Jun 201852.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Suava
26 Jun 201852.5AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
26 Jun 201852.5AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
28 Jul 201852.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Suava
5 Oct 201953.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Domenico e Sisto
5 Oct 201953.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 201954.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Domenico e Sisto
26 Sep 202256.7AppointedPrefect of the Dicastery for Culture and Education

MicroData Summary for José Tolentino Calaça de Mendonça
(VIAF: 75931910; WikiData: Q4459693)
José Tolentino Cardinal Calaça de Mendonça (born ) Prefect of Culture and Education

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMachico, Diocese of Funchal, Portugal
Ordained PriestCathedral, Funchal, Diocese of Funchal, Portugal
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Please contact the Cardinal through the Dicastery for Culture and Education.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 1 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Jul 2018
  • ab: CB, 28 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,827
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cdea: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 16 Jul 2024