Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José da Cruz Cardinal Policarpo

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio in Campo Marzio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1936BornAlvorninha
15 Aug 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
26 May 197842.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
26 May 197842.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
29 Jun 197842.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caliabria
5 Mar 199761.0AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Mar 199862.0SucceededPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
21 Feb 200164.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200164.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio in Campo Marzio
18 May 201377.2RetiredPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
12 Mar 201478.0DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José da Cruz Policarpo:
José da Cruz Cardinal Policarpo (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 May 2013
  • d: CB, 12 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 4 Jan 2015