Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Augusto da Silva Mendes, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Caliabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1948 Born
15 Apr 198133.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jul 198335.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jan 200859.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
31 Jan 200859.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
30 Mar 200860.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caliabria

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Augusto da Silva Mendes
Bishop Joaquim Augusto da Silva Mendes S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelões de Cepeda

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,698
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast