Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Délio Gonçalves Canavarro dos Reis

Bishop Emeritus of Setúbal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1940 BornVreia de Bornes
21 Dec 196323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vila Real, Portugal
29 Oct 198848.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
29 Oct 198848.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Mauretania
12 Feb 198948.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Mauretania
23 Apr 199857.9AppointedBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
24 Aug 201575.2RetiredBishop of Setúbal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Délio Gonçalves Canavarro dos Reis:
Bishop Gilberto Délio Gonçalves Canavarro dos Reis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Setúbal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Setúbal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,342
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 24 Aug 2015