Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Gonçalves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1936BornRevelhe
10 Jul 196024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
3 Aug 198145.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Aug 198145.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
18 Oct 198145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
19 May 198751.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal
19 Jan 199154.7SucceededBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
17 May 201175.0RetiredBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
31 Dec 201377.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vila Real, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Gonçalves:
Bishop Joaquim Gonçalves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2011
  • d: CB, 31 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013