Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António de Castro Xavier Monteiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1919BornSão João de Airão
15 Aug 194222.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 196444.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal
22 Feb 196444.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ombi
3 May 196444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ombi
3 Feb 196646.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Feb 196646.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
1 Jul 197252.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lamego, Portugal
5 Jan 199575.1RetiredBishop of Lamego, Portugal
13 Aug 200080.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António de Castro Xavier Monteiro:
Archbishop António de Castro Xavier Monteiro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamego

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013