Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António José Rafael

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1925Born
22 Aug 194822.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 197651.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
2 Dec 197651.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
13 Feb 197751.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua
26 Feb 197953.2AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
13 Jun 200175.5RetiredBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal
29 Jul 201892.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António José Rafael (VIAF: 306477781)
Bishop António José Rafael (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança-Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParadinha
Death PlaceBragança, Diocese of Bragança-Miranda
Buried Place (Original)Atrium of the Bishops, Cathedral, Bragança, Diocese of Bragança-Miranda

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 29 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jul 2018

Quantcast