Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Neto Quintas, S.C.I.

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1949 BornMazouco
29 Sep 196920.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
12 Jun 197727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
30 Jun 200050.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Jun 200050.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elicroca
3 Sep 200051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elicroca
22 Apr 200454.7AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Neto Quintas:
Bishop Manuel Neto Quintas S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Faro {Algarve}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013