Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Jesus Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1911BornBaldos
15 Jun 193322.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 194837.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Funchal, Portugal
7 Feb 194837.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Praenetus
15 Aug 194837.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praenetus
Apr 1953³42.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
20 Feb 196554.0AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
11 Sep 197867.6DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Jesus Pereira:
Bishop Manuel de Jesus Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015