Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Crisóstomo Gomes de Almeida

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Viseu

Titular Bishop of Ierafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1900BornParada de Ester
10 Jun 192323.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 195656.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Viseu, Portugal
18 Feb 195656.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierafi
8 Jun 195656.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierafi
12 Nov 196464.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Viseu, Portugal
18 Jan 199696.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Crisóstomo Gomes de Almeida:
Bishop João Crisóstomo Gomes de Almeida (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Viseu

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013