Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel d’Almeida Trindade

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aveiro, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1918Born
21 Dec 194224.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 196244.4AppointedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
16 Dec 196244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
20 Jan 198869.7ResignedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
5 Aug 200890.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel d’Almeida Trindade
Bishop Manuel d’Almeida Trindade (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aveiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonsanto

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 185
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast