Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho de Jesus e Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1877BornPensalves
19 Dec 190326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
4 Aug 192144.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
4 Aug 192144.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hauara
8 Dec 192144.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hauara
12 Jul 193558.3SucceededBishop of Lamego, Portugal
16 May 194265.1AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
21 Feb 195274.9DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Agostinho de Jesus e Souza:
Bishop Agostinho de Jesus e Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015