Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Valente da Fonseca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1884BornValega
21 Dec 190723.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 193146.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal
23 Oct 193146.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
21 Feb 193247.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
31 May 193348.5AppointedBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
10 Jan 196782.1ResignedBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
10 Jan 196782.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
27 Jan 197186.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Agbia
26 Feb 197287.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Vila Real, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Valente da Fonseca:
Bishop António Valente da Fonseca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013