Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Montes Moreira, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1935 Born
13 Jul 195823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Jun 200166.1AppointedBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal
14 Oct 200166.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal
18 Jul 201176.2RetiredBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Montes Moreira
Bishop António Montes Moreira O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança-Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Tomé do Castelo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança-Miranda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,070
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast