Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel António Mendes dos Santos, C.M.F.

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1960 BornLamego
26 Sep 198020.5ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
13 Jun 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1 Dec 200646.7AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
17 Feb 200746.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Manuel António Mendes dos Santos:
Bishop Manuel António Mendes dos Santos C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013