Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal Saraiva Martins, C.M.F.

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1932 BornGagos de Jarmelo, Portugal
16 Mar 195725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 May 198856.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thuburnica
26 May 198856.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
2 Jul 198856.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thuburnica
30 May 199866.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
21 Feb 200169.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
21 Feb 200169.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 200573.2CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
21 Apr 200573.3ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
9 Jul 200876.5RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
24 Feb 200977.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
19 Apr 200977.3InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for José Saraiva Martins:
Cardinal José Saraiva Martins C.M.F. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Causes of Saints

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,725
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013