Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Pieter Cardinal Schotte, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

President of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1928BornBeveren-Leie, Belgium
3 Aug 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
27 Jun 198052.1AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
20 Dec 198355.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
20 Dec 198355.6AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
6 Jan 198455.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silli
24 Apr 198556.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Silli
24 Apr 198556.9AppointedSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
14 Apr 198960.9AppointedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
26 Nov 199466.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi
26 Nov 199466.5Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 200475.7RetiredSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
10 Jan 200576.6DiedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Jan Pieter Schotte:
Jan Pieter Cardinal Schotte C.I.C.M. (born , died ) President of Labour Office of the Apostolic See

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015